H&R Block Tax Services LLC et al v. Emmerman, Boyle & Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Franchise Partner, Inc. and H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Defendant: David J. Emmerman, Emmerman, Boyle & Associates, LLC and Kevin P. Boyle
Case Number: 4:2019cv00453
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Before the Court is a Notice of Dismissal. (Doc. #9). Defendants have not yet served either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i).. Signed on 8/8/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Franchise Partner, Inc., H&R Block Tax Services LLC (Romano, Anthony)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 & #7 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Peter J Klarfeld and Justin Sallis for H&R Block Tax Services LLC and Franchise Partner, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow Justin L. Sallis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6416437) filed by Anthony J. Romano on behalf of Franchise Partner, Inc., H&R Block Tax Services LLC. (Romano, Anthony)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to allow Peter J. Klarfeld to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6416426) filed by Anthony J. Romano on behalf of Franchise Partner, Inc., H&R Block Tax Services LLC. (Romano, Anthony)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by H&R Block Tax Services LLC, Franchise Partner, Inc.. Kevin P. Boyle served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Romano, Anthony)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by H&R Block Tax Services LLC, Franchise Partner, Inc.. Emmerman, Boyle & Associates, LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Romano, Anthony)
June 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin P. Boyle, David J. Emmerman, Emmerman, Boyle & Associates, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony J. Romano on behalf of Plaintiffs Franchise Partner, Inc., H&R Block Tax Services LLC.(Romano, Anthony)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin P. Boyle, David J. Emmerman, Emmerman, Boyle & Associates, LLC filed by Anthony J. Romano on behalf of H&R Block Tax Services LLC, Franchise Partner, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6352254. Service due by 9/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Romano, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&R Block Tax Services LLC et al v. Emmerman, Boyle & Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Emmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmerman, Boyle & Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franchise Partner, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Romano
Represented By: Justin Sallis
Represented By: Peter J Klarfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Romano
Represented By: Justin Sallis
Represented By: Peter J Klarfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?