Hoversten v. GEICO Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Richard Hoversten
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00466
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 10/22/2020 at 8:30 a.m. Conference call-in numbers provided in order. Signed on 8/7/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/7/2019; order to issue. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Not present. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Emily Cipra. Time in court: 10:18 a.m. to 10:25 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Rachel Townsend on behalf of Plaintiff Richard Hoversten.(Townsend, Rachel)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of Defendant GEICO Casualty Company.(Hofer, Scott)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by GEICO Casualty Company. (Hofer, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED Defendant Geico Casualty Company's Motion for Leave to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses Out of Time (Doc. #5) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Defendant's answer to the second amended complaint (Doc. #5-1) is deemed properly filed on June 26, 2019. Signed on 7/3/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of Defendant GEICO Casualty Company.(Hofer, Scott)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to file filed by Scott David Hofer on behalf of GEICO Casualty Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Answer to Second Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 1-A Policy)(Hofer, Scott)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 7/19/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 7/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 6/18/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Crocker, Susan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Judge Ortrie D. Smith, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00466-CV-W-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 1816-CV23927, GEICO Casualty Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6357338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Jackson County Circuit Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hofer, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoversten v. GEICO Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hoversten
Represented By: Rachel Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Emily Lynn Cipra
Represented By: Philip V. Sumner
Represented By: Scott David Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?