Ledin v. U.S. Department of Treasury
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Ledin
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury Bureau of Fiscal Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv00489
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed U.S. Department of Treasury(green card only) (Kern, Kendra)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Jonathan E. Ledin. Waiver sent to U.S. Attorney Office 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green Card)(Kern, Kendra)
August 5, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED to Timothy Gribben, Commissioner, as to U.S. Department of Treasury Bureau of Fiscal Services. (Woods, Gloria)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se Plaintiff RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) re #1 Complaint. Summons issued on June 24, 2019 not attached to return of service. (Kern, Kendra)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order). Copy mailed via USPS to pro se Plaintiff on 06/25/19.(Woods, Gloria)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Treasury Bureau of Fiscal Services Jonathan E. Ledin. Filing fee $400, receipt number KCMO078313. Service due by 9/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledin v. U.S. Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Ledin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Treasury Bureau of Fiscal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?