Falco v. Bank of America N.A.
Plaintiff: Frank Falco
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00497
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Referring Judge: Ortrie D Smith
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to the Complaint. Defendant is to file its response by 9/25/2019. Signed on 8/22/19 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Bank of America N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Shredl, Steven)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Ortrie D. Smith, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00497-CV-W-RK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendant Bank of America N.A..(Shredl, Steven)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Bank of America, N.A. filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendant Bank of America N.A..(Shredl, Steven)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 7/18/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 9/3/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/17/2019. Corporate disclosures due by 8/2/2019. Signed on 7/18/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than August 26, 2019. Signed on 7/17/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew D. Guletz on behalf of Bank of America N.A. (Attorney Matthew D. Guletz added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft))(Guletz, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Bank of America N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Shredl, Steven)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Steven Shredl on behalf of Bank of America N.A. (Attorney Steven Shredl added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft))(Shredl, Steven)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Frank Falco. Bank of America N.A. served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Eastman, Gary)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Carlos Alsina-Batista for Frank Falco allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to allow Carlos Alsina-Batista to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6386105) filed by Gary T Eastman on behalf of Frank Falco. (Eastman, Gary)
July 1, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of America N.A.. (Woods, Gloria)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America N.A. filed by Gary T Eastman on behalf of Frank Falco. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6373020. Service due by 9/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Eastman, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falco v. Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Steven Shredl
Represented By: Matthew D. Guletz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Falco
Represented By: Gary T Eastman
Represented By: Carlos C Alsina-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?