Olsen v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Mark Olsen
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 4:2019cv00523
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 The Court hereby acknowledges the parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. #6). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed on 8/27/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of dismissal by Mark Olsen. (Sciolaro, Kyle)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED Defendants motion for extension of time (Doc. #3) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Defendant is granted an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before August 23, 2019. In the future, motions of this type should be filed at least three calendar days before the filing deadline dictated by rule. Signed on 8/5/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/3/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 8/20/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 8/2/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time , MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by William E. Hanna on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney William E. Hanna added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Hanna, William)
July 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Woods, Gloria)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Kyle Henry Sciolaro on behalf of Mark Olsen. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6387613. Service due by 10/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sciolaro, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsen v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: William E. Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Olsen
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?