Irby v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Anthony Irby
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00535
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Destiny L Bounds on behalf of Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company.(Bounds, Destiny)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Anthony Irby. (Martens, Phillip)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Phillip Reed Martens on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Irby.(Martens, Phillip)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim Zurich American Insurance Company on behalf of Anthony Irby.(Martens, Phillip)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Anthony Irby,Zurich American Insurance Company. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/9/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 8/26/2019. Signed on 7/19/2019 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Stepp, Jane)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against Anthony Irby on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fields, Larry)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Larry David Fields on behalf of Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company.(Fields, Larry)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to both Plaintiff and Defendant's attorneys. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 7/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Brian T. Fenimore. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 1916-CV15887, filed by Larry David Fields on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6393540. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fields, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irby v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Irby
Represented By: Phillip Reed Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Larry David Fields
Represented By: Destiny L Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?