Ruth v. Mallinckrodt LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Ruth
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00543
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Melvin, Greg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (McIlvain, Kelly)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER pursuant to the parties agreement, (1) the Agreed Motion is GRANTED and (2) the Motion for Remand is GRANTED without costs or attorney fees awarded to Plaintiff. This case is hereby remanded to the Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri. Signed on 7/19/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (McIlvain, Kelly)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for order Entry of Agreed Order to Remand re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Thompson, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Robert L Kinsman on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Ruth. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Attorney Robert L Kinsman added to party Robert Ruth(pty:pla))(Kinsman, Robert) Modified on 7/16/2019: Document deleted at request of filing counsel. This document was intended to be a reply suggestions to #6 Motion to expedite, not #5 Motion to remand. Additionally, an order granting #6 Motion to expedite was filed by the Court prior to the docketing of this document. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 motion to expedite; denying #8 motion to stay. Defendants shall respond to the Motion to Remand on or before July 19, 2019. Plaintiff shall have until July 26 to file Reply Suggestions or indicate that he does not intend to file Reply Suggestions. The Court intends to rule on the Motion to Remand before the Conditional Transfer Order becomes final, so these deadlines will not be extended. Defendants may renew their Motion to Stay if the case is not remanded. Signed on 7/16/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to expedite the Briefing Schedule and Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC. Reply suggestions due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Thompson, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Thompson, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File responsive Pleading is GRANTED. Defendant has 60 days to file a responsive leading after the later of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate any conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand this action to the Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri. Signed on 7/12/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to expedite the Briefing Schedule and Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Charles F. Speer on behalf of Robert Ruth. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Speer, Charles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to remand filed by Charles F. Speer on behalf of Robert Ruth. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Speer, Charles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Thompson, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Defendants Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC.(Thompson, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV15077, filed by Robert M. Thompson on behalf of Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6396181. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruth v. Mallinckrodt LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: William Easley
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: William Easley
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Represented By: William Easley
Represented By: Robert M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ruth
Represented By: Charles F. Speer
Represented By: Robert L Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?