McWilliams v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey McWilliams
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00544
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/27/2020. Status Conference set for 2/4/2020 10:30 AM; Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2020 10:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 10:30 AM; and Bench Trial set for 9/21/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on September 3, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Rich McLeod(Sciolaro, Kyle)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Jeffrey McWilliams. (Sciolaro, Kyle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Davidson, Steven)
July 17, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 Notice of Removal. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company's answer due 8/8/2019. Signed on July 12, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, (Unopposed) filed by Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Davidson, Steven)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 8/10/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/5/2019. Signed on July 11, 2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/11/2019 due to clerical error; NEF regenerated) (Ellis, Lindsey).
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV13097, filed by Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6396213. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit)(Davidson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McWilliams v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey McWilliams
Represented By: Kyle Henry Sciolaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?