Nationwide Insurance Company of America v. McCain
Plaintiff: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Christian V. McCain
Case Number: 4:2019cv00550
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert L. Brady on behalf of Plaintiff Nationwide Insurance Company of America.(Brady, Robert)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/12/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 10/2/2019. Signed on 8/28/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Nationwide Insurance Company of America on behalf of Christian V. McCain.(Attorney Michael D. Townsend added to party Christian V. McCain(pty:dft))(Townsend, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Christian V. McCain served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Brady, Robert) Modified on 8/15/2019 to correct docket entry (Houston, Kiambu).
July 19, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christian V. McCain. (Kern, Kendra)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nationwide Insurance Company of America. (Brady, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Robert L. Brady on behalf of Nationwide Insurance Company of America (Brady, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Christian V. McCain filed by Robert L. Brady on behalf of Nationwide Insurance Company of America. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6398447. Service due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brady, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Insurance Company of America v. McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Robert L. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian V. McCain
Represented By: Michael D. Townsend
Represented By: James Farley Peddicord, II
Represented By: Eryn M Peddicord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?