American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I. v. G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.
Defendant: Wayne A. Mikle, Tracy Hinkle, POAH Communities, LLC, Deborah Johnson, Hawthorne Associates, L.P., Nathan L. Bond, Alexis R. Bond, G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership, Gloria Morelock and Lisa M. L. Bond
Case Number: 4:2019cv00551
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Philip Charles Graham on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Graham, Philip)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kenneth J. Berra on behalf of Defendant G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership.(Berra, Kenneth)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS HAWTHORNE ASSOCIATES LP AND POAH COMMUNITIES LLC TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed on 8/27/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Order mailed to POAH Communities, LLC and Hawthorne Associates, L.P. at the addresses listed in the Order.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Copy mailed on 8/27/2019 to POAH Communities, LLC, c/o Registered Agent - CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Co., 221 Bolivar Street, Jefferson City MO 65101 via certified and regular mail (7015 0640 0000 9979 7099) and to Hawthorne Associates, LP, c/o Registered Agent - CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Co., 221 Bolivar Street, Jefferson City MO 65101 via certified and regular mail (7015 0640 0000 9979 7112) (Houston, Kiambu).
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Philip Charles Graham on behalf of Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I..(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service unexecuted by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I. as to Tracy Hinkle. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Summons for Tracy Hinkle)(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.. POAH Communities, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of POAH Communities, LLC)(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service unexecuted by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I. as to Nathan L. Bond. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Updated Summons for Nathan Bond)(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service unexecuted by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I. as to Lisa M. L. Bond. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Updated Summons for Lisa Bond)(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.. Hawthorne Associates, L.P. served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Hawthorne Associates LP)(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.. G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of GPH Family Limited Partnership)(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.. Gloria Morelock served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Gloria Morelock)(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.. Deborah Johnson served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service of Deborah Johnson)(Graham, Philip)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service unexecuted by American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I. as to Alexis R. Bond. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Updated Summons for Alexis R. Bond)(Graham, Philip)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Patrick Michael Hunt on behalf of Hawthorne Associates, L.P., Deborah Johnson, Gloria Morelock, POAH Communities, LLC (Attorney Patrick Michael Hunt added to party Hawthorne Associates, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Michael Hunt added to party Deborah Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Michael Hunt added to party Gloria Morelock(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Michael Hunt added to party POAH Communities, LLC(pty:dft))(Hunt, Patrick)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand on behalf of Gloria Morelock.(Attorney Theresa A. Otto added to party Gloria Morelock(pty:dft))(Otto, Theresa)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 8/12/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 9/26/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/10/2019. Corporate disclosures due by 8/27/2019. Signed on 8/12/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, For Declaratory Judgment on behalf of Deborah Johnson.(Attorney Theresa A. Otto added to party Deborah Johnson(pty:dft))(Otto, Theresa)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, on behalf of G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership.(Attorney Kenneth J. Berra added to party G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership(pty:dft))(Berra, Kenneth)
July 26, 2019 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Alexis R. Bond, Lisa M. L. Bond, Nathan L. Bond, Hawthorne Associates, L.P., POAH Communities, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
July 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alexis R. Bond, Lisa M. L. Bond, Nathan L. Bond, G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership, Hawthorne Associates, L.P., Tracy Hinkle, Deborah Johnson, Wayne A. Mikle, Gloria Morelock, POAH Communities, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 15, 2019 FILING FEE for new civil case. Receipt no. AMOWDC-6399489 for $400 filing fee. (Graham, Philip)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants filed by Philip Charles Graham on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.. Filing fee $400, receipt number pending. Service due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Graham, Philip) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/15/2019 due to formatting error) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I. v. G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne A. Mikle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POAH Communities, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Michael Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Johnson
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Represented By: Patrick Michael Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawthorne Associates, L.P.
Represented By: Patrick Michael Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan L. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis R. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.P.H. Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Kenneth J. Berra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Morelock
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Represented By: Patrick Michael Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa M. L. Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company S.I.
Represented By: Benjamin R. Wesselschmidt
Represented By: Philip Charles Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?