Cottages Senior Housing of Belton v. City of Belton, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Cottages Senior Housing of Belton
Defendant: City of Belton, Missouri, Briar Creek Villas, L.P., Freddy's Land, LLC, I-49 Investors, LLC and TR Missouri, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00557
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of I-49 Investors, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McPherson, Brendan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of TR Missouri, LLC.(Schultz, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Michael J Norton on behalf of Defendant Freddy's Land, LLC.(Norton, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Freddy's Land, LLC.(Norton, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of appearance by John Michael Graham, Jr on behalf of I-49 Investors, LLC (Attorney John Michael Graham, Jr added to party I-49 Investors, LLC(pty:dft))(Graham, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of appearance by Sherman A Botts on behalf of Briar Creek Villas, L.P. (Attorney Sherman A Botts added to party Briar Creek Villas, L.P.(pty:dft))(Botts, Sherman)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of appearance by Brandon Dale Mizner on behalf of City of Belton, Missouri (Attorney Brandon Dale Mizner added to party City of Belton, Missouri(pty:dft))(Mizner, Brandon)
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of appearance by Padraic William Corcoran on behalf of City of Belton, Missouri (Corcoran, Padraic)
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of City of Belton, Missouri.(Attorney Padraic William Corcoran added to party City of Belton, Missouri(pty:dft))(Corcoran, Padraic)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 20, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of Defendant I-49 Investors, LLC.(McPherson, Brendan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of I-49 Investors, LLC.(Attorney Brendan L. McPherson added to party I-49 Investors, LLC(pty:dft))(McPherson, Brendan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 9/16/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/30/2019. Signed on 8/15/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Freddy's Land, LLC's answer is due September 12, 2019. Signed on August 14, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Michael J Norton on behalf of Freddy's Land, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Norton, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of appearance by Michael J Norton on behalf of Freddy's Land, LLC (Attorney Michael J Norton added to party Freddy's Land, LLC(pty:dft))(Norton, Michael)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian Edward Sobczyk on behalf of Defendant Briar Creek Villas, L.P..(Sobczyk, Brian)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James H Maggard on behalf of Plaintiff Cottages Senior Housing of Belton.(Maggard, James)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Briar Creek Villas, L.P..(Attorney Brian Edward Sobczyk added to party Briar Creek Villas, L.P.(pty:dft))(Sobczyk, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. TR Missouri, LLC's answer is due September 12, 2019. Signed on August 12, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
August 11, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Schultz, III on behalf of TR Missouri, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Schultz, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of counsel Disclosure of Corporation Interests by Robert Schultz, III on behalf of TR Missouri, LLC (Schultz, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Robert Schultz, III on behalf of TR Missouri, LLC (Attorney Robert Schultz, III added to party TR Missouri, LLC(pty:dft))(Schultz, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cottages Senior Housing of Belton. City of Belton, Missouri served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Whiston, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cottages Senior Housing of Belton. I-49 Investors, LLC served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Whiston, Gregory)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cottages Senior Housing of Belton. Freddy's Land, LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Whiston, Gregory) Modified on 8/2/2019 to correct served date and answer due date (Crocker, Susan).
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cottages Senior Housing of Belton. TR Missouri, LLC served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Whiston, Gregory) Modified on 7/30/2019 to correct service date and answer due date (Crocker, Susan).
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Cottages Senior Housing of Belton. Briar Creek Villas, L.P. served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Whiston, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by James H Maggard on behalf of Cottages Senior Housing of Belton (Maggard, James)
July 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Briar Creek Villas, L.P., City of Belton, Missouri, Freddy's Land, LLC, I-49 Investors, LLC, TR Missouri, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gregory B Whiston on behalf of Cottages Senior Housing of Belton. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6402032. Service due by 10/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whiston, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottages Senior Housing of Belton v. City of Belton, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Belton, Missouri
Represented By: Brandon Dale Mizner
Represented By: James Harold Ensz
Represented By: Christopher M Napolitano
Represented By: Padraic William Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briar Creek Villas, L.P.
Represented By: Sherman A Botts
Represented By: Brian Edward Sobczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddy's Land, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Norton
Represented By: Daniel Jay Buller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I-49 Investors, LLC
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: John Michael Graham, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TR Missouri, LLC
Represented By: Robert Schultz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cottages Senior Housing of Belton
Represented By: Gregory B Whiston
Represented By: James H Maggard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?