Davidson v. Stringer
Petitioner: Dean Bryan Davidson
Respondent: Mark Stringer
Case Number: 4:2019cv00566
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, CDs, videos, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. (CLERK'S NOTE: All documents pertaining to this case are on CM/ECF. Nothing will be sent to the Court of Appeals.) (Davies, Cindy)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of US COURT OF APPEALS: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by October 11, 2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. (Davies, Cindy)
September 13, 2019 USCA Case Number from 8th Circuit is 19-2984 for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Dean Bryan Davidson. (Davies, Cindy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document #6 Notice of Appeal. (Davies, Cindy)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: ORDERED that Petitioner is denied leave to appeal in forma pauperis and that the Clerk of the Court electronically forward this case to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit for further processing of Petitioner's appeal. Further, it is ORDERED that Petitioners motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #7 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed on September 12, 2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Davies, Cindy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 PETITIONER'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Dean Bryan Davidson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/23/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Doc. #4 Order filed by Dean Bryan Davidson. (Davies, Cindy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Willis, Kathy)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed on 08/07/2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT filed by Dean Bryan Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Willis, Kathy)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Dean Bryan Davidson. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dean Bryan Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?