United States of America v. United States Currency
Plaintiff: United State of America and United States of America
Defendant: United States Currency
Case Number: 4:2019cv00587
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to United States Currency. United States Currency served on 8/7/2019. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Christopher Barnes by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Dajuan Hector by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Dajuan Hector by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Kou Chue by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Larry Mitchell by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Derek Barnes by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint and Complaint to Mindy Sue Barnes by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against $16,410.00 in United States Currency filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United State of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 10/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United State of America
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?