Hernandez v. YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cheryleen Hernandez
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc. and Darren Whitton
Case Number: 4:2019cv00597
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/6/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/6/2019. Discovery Motions due by 3/31/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2020. Proposed Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 6/15/2020. Signed on 9/25/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Fowler, Amy)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Sarah C. Liesen on behalf of Plaintiff Cheryleen Hernandez.(Liesen, Sarah)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Amy M Fowler on behalf of Defendant Darren Whitton. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Fowler, Amy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Alexander Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff Cheryleen Hernandez. Reply suggestions due by 9/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Edelman, Alexander)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/23/2019. Signed on 8/9/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of YRC Worldwide, Inc..(Hilker Vaglio, Christi)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Christi Hilker Vaglio on behalf of Defendant Darren Whitton. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Hilker Vaglio, Christi)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Christi Hilker Vaglio on behalf of Darren Whitton. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hilker Vaglio, Christi)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 1916-CV14623, filed by Amy M Fowler on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6422575. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fowler, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryleen Hernandez
Represented By: Sarah C. Liesen
Represented By: Alexander Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Amy M Fowler
Represented By: Christi Hilker Vaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Whitton
Represented By: Amy M Fowler
Represented By: Christi Hilker Vaglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?