Cannady v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rachel Lynn Cannady
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00609
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION to remand in support filed by David A Lunceford on behalf of Plaintiff Rachel Lynn Cannady. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Lunceford, David)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - GRANTING #12 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Pamela Nagel Jorgensen is hereby terminated as co-counsel for plaintiff as of the date of this order. Signed on 9/18/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Pamela Nagel Jorgensen on behalf of Rachel Lynn Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jorgensen, Pamela)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - GRANTING #7 motion to stay. All pretrial deadlines are stayed until the Court rules on the pending motion to remand. Signed on 9/16/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 9/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (DeVeney, Jeannie)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rachel Lynn Cannady filed by David A Lunceford on behalf of Plaintiff Rachel Lynn Cannady.(Lunceford, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hy-Vee, Inc. of (1) Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff and (2) Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc.'s First Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to stay filed by David A Lunceford on behalf of Rachel Lynn Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lunceford, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to remand filed by David A Lunceford on behalf of Rachel Lynn Cannady. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lunceford, David)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/23/2019. Signed on 8/9/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Brian T. Fenimore. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 1916-CV16899, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMOWDC-6428021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(DeVeney, Jeannie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannady v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Lynn Cannady
Represented By: Pamela Nagel Jorgensen
Represented By: David A Lunceford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Jennifer Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?