Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund et al v. Concrete Strategies, LLC
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Scott Rettig, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund and Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: Concrete Strategies, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00634
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John Phillips(Groark, Samantha)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/8/2020. Pretrial Conference via telephone conference to be initiated by plaintiffs' counsel set for 11/5/2020 01:30 PM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Bench Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. Signed on 10/9/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 10/8/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Operating Engineers Local No 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Health and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Scott Rettig. (Groark, Samantha)
October 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/4/2019 as Document No. 10, Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Houston, Kiambu)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Operating Engineers Local No 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Health and Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Scott Rettig. (Groark, Samantha)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/8/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/28/2019. Signed on 9/3/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Bryan M. Kaemmerer on behalf of Defendant Concrete Strategies, LLC.(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, on behalf of Concrete Strategies, LLC.(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Bryan M. Kaemmerer on behalf of Concrete Strategies, LLC (Attorney Bryan M. Kaemmerer added to party Concrete Strategies, LLC(pty:dft))(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Michael E. Kaemmerer on behalf of Concrete Strategies, LLC (Attorney Michael E. Kaemmerer added to party Concrete Strategies, LLC(pty:dft))(Kaemmerer, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Operating Engineers Local No 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Health and Welfare Fund, Scott Rettig. Concrete Strategies, LLC served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Groark, Samantha)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Operating Engineers Local No 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Health and Welfare Fund, Scott Rettig. Concrete Strategies, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Groark, Samantha)
August 13, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Concrete Strategies, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
August 12, 2019 FILING FEE for new civil case. Receipt no. AMOWDC-6441055 for $400 filing fee. (Groark, Samantha)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Concrete Strategies, LLC filed by Samantha L Groark on behalf of Operating Engineers Local No 101, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund, Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Health and Welfare Fund, Scott Rettig. Filing fee $400, receipt numberAMOWDC-6441055. Service due by 11/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Groark, Samantha) Modified on 8/12/2019 to update receipt information (Jones, Robin).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund et al v. Concrete Strategies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No 101
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Samantha L Groark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Samantha L Groark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Joint Apprenticeship and Skill Improvement Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Samantha L Groark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Rettig
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Samantha L Groark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Pension Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Samantha L Groark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local No. 101 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Represented By: Samantha L Groark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concrete Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Bryan M. Kaemmerer
Represented By: Michael E. Kaemmerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?