Harris v. O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center
Plaintiff: Kaneisha Harris
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center and O
Case Number: 4:2019cv00652
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by William C Martucci on behalf of O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center (Attorney William C Martucci added to party O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center(pty:dft))(Martucci, William)
October 9, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/22/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/8/2019. Signed on 10/8/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Ashley Nichole Harrison on behalf of Defendant O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center.(Harrison, Ashley)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center.(Attorney Ashley Nichole Harrison added to party O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center(pty:dft))(Harrison, Ashley)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kaneisha Harris. O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Allen, Lauren)
September 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center. (Crocker, Susan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lauren Perkins Allen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6453558. Service due by 11/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Allen, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Parts Distribution Center
Represented By: William C Martucci
Represented By: Ashley Nichole Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O
Represented By: William C Martucci
Represented By: Ashley Nichole Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaneisha Harris
Represented By: Lauren Perkins Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?