Cooper v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Tammy Cooper
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00668
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Richard Lawrence Budden on behalf of Plaintiff Tammy Cooper. Reply suggestions due by 10/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Budden, Richard)
October 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing WITHDRAW ITS PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS AND FILE AN ANSWER by FCA US LLC re #4 MOTION to dismiss case with Suggestions in Support (Beashore, Chad)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER In light of Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Plaintiff's Punitive Damages Claim (Doc. #14 ), it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's punitive damages claim against Defendant is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed on 10/11/2019 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of dismissal Without Prejudice of Punitive Damages Claim by Tammy Cooper. (Budden, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion for extension of time to file response/reply as to #4 MOTION to dismiss case with Suggestions in Support, #5 MOTION to reassign/transfer case up through and including October 15, 2019. Signed on 9/25/2019 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #4 MOTION to dismiss case with Suggestions in Support, #5 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Richard Lawrence Budden on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #4 , #5 ) (Budden, Richard)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Bailey Samuel on behalf of FCA US LLC (Attorney Bailey Samuel added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Samuel, Bailey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by William Clark Richardson on behalf of FCA US LLC (Attorney William Clark Richardson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Richardson, William)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/21/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/4/2019. Signed on 9/19/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of FCA US LLC (Beashore, Chad)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC.(Beashore, Chad)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to reassign/transfer case and Stay Case filed by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Beashore, Chad)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to reassign/transfer case filed by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of FCA US LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Beashore, Chad)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss case with Suggestions in Support filed by Chad R. Beashore on behalf of FCA US LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Attorney Chad R. Beashore added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Beashore, Chad)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Tammy Cooper. FCA US LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Nutter, Scott)
August 23, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FCA US LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC filed by Scott Eric Nutter on behalf of Tammy Cooper. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6459448. Service due by 11/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nutter, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Bailey Samuel
Represented By: William Clark Richardson
Represented By: Chad R. Beashore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Cooper
Represented By: Dennis J Cassidy
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Represented By: Scott Eric Nutter
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Budden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?