Jarvis v. Electric Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alan Jarvis
Defendant: Electric Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00669
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Shawn M. Rogers on behalf of Defendant Electric Insurance Company.(Rogers, Shawn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Roger W. Warren(Rogers, Shawn)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Electric Insurance Company. (Rogers, Shawn)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 ORDER. Please see text of order. Signed on 9/3/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) /First Amended Petition filed by Shawn M. Rogers on behalf of Defendant Electric Insurance Company. (Rogers, Shawn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Shawn M. Rogers on behalf of Defendant Electric Insurance Company.(Rogers, Shawn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Place of Trial by Electric Insurance Company. (Rogers, Shawn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 1916-CV12892, filed by Shawn M. Rogers on behalf of Electric Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6459609. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarvis v. Electric Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Jarvis
Represented By: Chad G Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electric Insurance Company
Represented By: Shawn M. Rogers
Represented By: Megan R Stumph-Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?