Rey et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Isaiah Quinn, Jessica Leanne Quinn, Jesslyn Quinn, Elijah Quinn and Nicolas Valadez Rey
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00714
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 11/18/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/2/2019. Signed on 10/18/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 & 12 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys John D. Black and Michael P. Cooney for General Motors, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to allow Michael P. Cooney to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6542893) filed by Stephen J. Torline on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Torline, Stephen)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Greg Kays. Please note the new case number: 19-714-CV-W-DGK. (Melvin, Greg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow John D. Black to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6540434) filed by Stephen J. Torline on behalf of General Motors, LLC. (Torline, Stephen)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Bradley L Leger and Kassi Dee Patrick Marks for E. Q., I. Q., J. Q., Jessica Leanne Quinn, and Nicolas Valadez Rey allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. ; This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
October 10, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 10/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg) Modified on 10/10/2019: Form was emailed to counsel for defendant, not plaintiff. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Stephen J. Torline on behalf of Defendant General Motors, LLC.(Torline, Stephen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint on behalf of General Motors, LLC.(Attorney Stephen J. Torline added to party General Motors, LLC(pty:dft))(Torline, Stephen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow Kassi Marks to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6528222) filed by Adam M. Evans on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Evans, Adam)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to allow Bradley Leger to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6528205) filed by Adam M. Evans on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Evans, Adam)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Adam M. Evans on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Evans, Adam)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER Document # 1 does not comply with the United Stated District Court, Western District of Missouri's Privacy Policy. Plaintiffs have filed an amended complaint, Doc. # 3 , but that document contains at least one reference to the full names of minor children. Plaintiffs are directed to file a second-amended complaint on or before September 30, 2019, which complies with the Privacy Policy. The Court further orders that Documents # 1 and # 3 be sealed. Signed on September 16, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
September 10, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors, LLC. (Melvin, Greg)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for plaintiffs. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 9/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rey et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaiah Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Leanne Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesslyn Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Valadez Rey
Represented By: Adam M. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?