Yoakum v. Genuine Parts Company et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Yoakum
Defendant: Authorized Motor Parts Corporation d/b/a Napa Auto Parts, Warren Oil Company, LLC, Geuine Parts Company, Authorized Motor Parts Corporation and Genuine Parts Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00718
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Defendant Warren Oil Company, LLC's Unopposed Motion for a 7-Day Second Extension of Time to File its Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 33) is GRANTED, up to and including November 11, 2019. Signed on 11/5/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
November 4, 2019 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #24 Amended Complaint filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Warren Oil Company, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #24 ) (Morris, James)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/27/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/27/2020. Motion for Class Certification due 6/19/20. Teleconference set for 6/11/2021 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2021 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 7/12/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 11/1/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
November 1, 2019 Filing 31 DESIGNATION of Mediator by Jesse Yoakum. (White, Bryan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 30 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Case Management Report by Jesse Yoakum. (White, Bryan)
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint on behalf of Genuine Parts Company.(Higgins, Angela)
October 22, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jesse Yoakum filed by Bryan White on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Yoakum.(White, Bryan)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Defendant Warren Oil Company, LLC's Unopposed Motion for a 14-Day Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 26) is GRANTED, up to and including November 4, 2019. Signed on 10/21/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
October 20, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file responsive pleading filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Warren Oil Company, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Morris, James)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Defendant Warren Oil Company, LLCs Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 10) and Defendant Genuine Parts Companys Motion to Dismiss or For More Definite Statement (Doc. 17) are DENIED AS MOOT because Plaintiff has filed a First Amended Class Action Complaint. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B). Signed on 10/7/2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIlvain, Kelly)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Authorized Motor Parts Corporation, Genuine Parts Company, Warren Oil Company, LLC filed by Bryan White on behalf of Jesse Yoakum.(White, Bryan)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 -Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Genuine Parts Companys Motion to Dismiss or For More Definite Statement (Doc. 22) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file his response on or before October 21, 2019. Signed on 10/7/2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIlvain, Kelly)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #17 MOTION to dismiss case or For More Definite Statement filed by Bryan White on behalf of Jesse Yoakum. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #17 ) (White, Bryan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Authorized Motor Parts Corporation only. (McIlvain, Kelly)
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Genuine Parts Company. (Higgins, Angela)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Warren Oil Company, LLC. (Morris, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #17 MOTION to dismiss case or For More Definite Statement filed by Angela M. Higgins on behalf of Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Higgins, Angela)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to dismiss case or For More Definite Statement filed by Angela M. Higgins on behalf of Genuine Parts Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Higgins, Angela)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of change of address by James C. Morris (Morris, James)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Authorized Motor Parts Corporation by Jesse Yoakum. (White, Bryan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Defendant Warren Oil Company, LLC.(Morris, James)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Warren Oil Company, LLCs Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 12) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its response on or before October 21, 2019. Signed on 9/26/2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIlvain, Kelly)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Warren Oil, LLC's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Bryan White on behalf of Jesse Yoakum. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (White, Bryan)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Defendant Warren Oil Company, LLC. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Morris, James)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Warren Oil Company, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Morris, James)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 - The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Petition (Doc. 8) is GRANTED. Defendants Genuine Parts Company and Authorized Motor Parts Corporation shall file their response on or before October 2, 2019. Signed on 9/16/2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIlvain, Kelly)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Angela M. Higgins on behalf of Authorized Motor Parts Corporation, Genuine Parts Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Angela M. Higgins added to party Authorized Motor Parts Corporation(pty:dft))(Higgins, Angela)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/29/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 10/15/2019. Signed on 9/13/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by John E. Patterson on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Attorney John E. Patterson added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Patterson, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Shawn M. Rogers on behalf of Genuine Parts Company (Attorney Shawn M. Rogers added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Rogers, Shawn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Angela M. Higgins on behalf of Defendant Geuine Parts Company.(Higgins, Angela)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Joinder in Removal by Defendant Warren Oil Company, LLC and Separate Notice of Removal from Circuit Court of Cass County, Missouri County, case number 19CA-CC00183, filed by Angela M. Higgins on behalf of Geuine Parts Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6485189. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit Remainder of State Court File)(Higgins, Angela)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cass County, Missouri County, case number 19CA-CC00183, filed by James C. Morris on behalf of Warren Oil Company, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6481401. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morris, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoakum v. Genuine Parts Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authorized Motor Parts Corporation d/b/a Napa Auto Parts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Oil Company, LLC
Represented By: James C. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Authorized Motor Parts Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Represented By: John E. Patterson
Represented By: Shawn M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Yoakum
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Represented By: Thomas V Bender
Represented By: Clayton Jones
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: William L Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?