Jordan v. Genesis Health Clubs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mario Jordan
Defendant: Bessine Walterbach, LLP and Genesis Health Clubs, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00741
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 10/8/2020 at 9:00 a.m. See order for conference call-in numbers. Signed on 11/1/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
November 1, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/1/2019; order to issue. Court sets a briefing schedule regarding the jurisdictional issue as stated on the record. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Chiya C. Lloyd. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Sam Barfoot. Time in court: 9:18 a.m. to 9:28 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Chiya C Lloyd on behalf of Plaintiff Mario Jordan.(Lloyd, Chiya)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Lloyd, Chiya)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Samuel Barfoot on behalf of Defendant Genesis Health Clubs, LLC.(Barfoot, Samuel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of Defendant Genesis Health Clubs, LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (McPherson, Brendan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Genesis Health Clubs, LLC. (Barfoot, Samuel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Samuel Barfoot on behalf of Genesis Health Clubs, LLC (Attorney Samuel Barfoot added to party Genesis Health Clubs, LLC(pty:dft))(Barfoot, Samuel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chiya C Lloyd on behalf of Plaintiff Mario Jordan. Reply suggestions due by 10/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Set Aside Default)(Related document(s) #6 ) (Lloyd, Chiya)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 2ND AMENDED - NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, Scheduling Conference is RESET for 11/1/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of Defendant Genesis Health Clubs, LLC.(McPherson, Brendan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 **AMENDED** NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/21/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of Defendant Genesis Health Clubs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Associate Circuit Case)(Related document(s) #6 ) (McPherson, Brendan)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brendan L. McPherson on behalf of Genesis Health Clubs, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (McPherson, Brendan)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/17/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 10/10/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 9/12/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Genesis Health Clubs, LLC filed by Chiya C Lloyd on behalf of Mario Jordan.(Lloyd, Chiya)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against Mario Jordan Mario Jordan.(Lloyd, Chiya)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 1916-CV20461, Bessine Walterbach, LLP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6485273. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(Larson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Genesis Health Clubs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Jordan
Represented By: Chiya C Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bessine Walterbach, LLP
Represented By: David E Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Health Clubs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?