Ellis v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Ellis
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00750
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 11/4/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc. answers are due on or before 12/9/2019. Signed on 10/30/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint filed by David Brenton Dwerlkotte on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney David Brenton Dwerlkotte added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dwerlkotte, David)
September 26, 2019 Utility- deleted answer due date for plaintiff as wrong party chosen by counsel when docketing return of service. (Ellis, Lindsey)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Scott Ellis. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Jorgensen, Pamela)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Scott Ellis. Nissan Motor Company, Ltd. served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Jorgensen, Pamela)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/24/19 as Document No. 3 and 4, RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed. Counsel did not select the right party served on either entry for return of service, second Return of Service did not set answer deadline. Counsel is directed to refile Returns of Service and select proper defendant served for each return and complete service dates to set answer due deadlines. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Ashley Scott Waddell on behalf of Scott Ellis (Attorney Ashley Scott Waddell added to party Scott Ellis(pty:pla))(Waddell, Ashley)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Scott Ellis. (Jorgensen, Pamela)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Scott Ellis. Scott Ellis served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Jorgensen, Pamela)
September 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nissan Motor Company, Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Pamela Nagel Jorgensen on behalf of Scott Ellis. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6490915. Service due by 12/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jorgensen, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: David Brenton Dwerlkotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Ellis
Represented By: Pamela Nagel Jorgensen
Represented By: Jack D McInnes
Represented By: Ashley Scott Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?