Butcher v. David Ertel, et al
Plaintiff: Blessing Nnedinma Butcher
Defendant: David Ertel, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Richard Thomas O'Brien
Case Number: 4:2019cv00755
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 PRO SE NOTICE of filing Demand to strike... by Blessing Nnedinma Butcher. (Woods, Gloria)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order - DENYING plaintiff's petition for a writ of habeas corpus. This matter is hereby dismissed. Signed on 11/8/19 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Copy of Order mailed via first class and certified mail (Rct No. 7016 3560 0000 4920 2449) to Blessing Nnedinma Butcher at c/o 10518 E. 19th Terr. So., Independence, MO 64052. (Anderson, Christy)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William J Dorsey on behalf of Defendants David Ertel, Richard Thomas O'Brien. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Dorsey, William)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on behalf of Plaintiff Blessing Nnedinma Butcher. Reply suggestions due by 11/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Truth, #2 Notice and Affidavit, #3 Memorandum in Opposition, #4 Notice of Default, #5 Declaration of Cancellation)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Crocker, Susan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William J Dorsey on behalf of Defendants David Ertel, Richard Thomas O'Brien. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Dorsey, William)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William J Dorsey on behalf of David Ertel, Richard Thomas O'Brien. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney William J Dorsey added to party David Ertel(pty:dft), Attorney William J Dorsey added to party Richard Thomas O'Brien(pty:dft))(Dorsey, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a related case, this case is reassigned to the Honorable Judge Howard F. Sachs for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00755-CV-W-HFS. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff (Moore, Terri).
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 (Document titled) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se Plaintiff Blessing Nnedinma Butcher. (Attachments: #1 Request for Immediate Hearing of Necessity, #2 Praecipe to Clerk of the Court)(Moore, Terri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butcher v. David Ertel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ertel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Thomas O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blessing Nnedinma Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?