Fullmer v. StarNet Insurance Company et al ***DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE- Case Consolidated with 19-00763. All Pleadings to be filed in 19-00763. ***
Plaintiff: Henry Fullmer
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois and StarNet Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00765
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: As Case Nos. 19-cv-763-SRB and 19-cv-765-SRB are removal actions from the same underlying state-court action, the cases are consolidated for all further proceedings. All future filings should be submitted only in Case No. 19-cv-763-SRB. Signed on 9/26/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. District Judge Greg Kays no longer assigned to case. Signed on 9/26/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion to consolidate cases. Signed on 9/26/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Josephine Marie Pottebaum Abshier on behalf of StarNet Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Abshier, Josephine)
September 25, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Corporate Disclosure Statement by StarNet Insurance Company improperly named as Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Abshier, Josephine)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 10/21/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/4/2019. Signed on 9/20/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing of Removal by StarNet Insurance Company improperly named as Berkley Regional Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Abshier, Josephine)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV20457, filed by Josephine Marie Pottebaum Abshier on behalf of StarNet Insurance Company improperly named as Berkley Regional Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6500429. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket and Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal in State Court)(Abshier, Josephine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fullmer v. StarNet Insurance Company et al ***DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE- Case Consolidated with 19-00763. All Pleadings to be filed in 19-00763. ***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Fullmer
Represented By: Pamela J. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StarNet Insurance Company
Represented By: Josephine Marie Pottebaum Abshier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?