Runnels v. Stanley Steemer International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lateef Runnels
Defendant: Stanley Steemer International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00767
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0216
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert H. Bernstein on behalf of Defendant Stanley Steemer International, Inc..(Bernstein, Robert)
October 23, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/5/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/21/2019. Signed on 10/21/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 16, 2019 Defendants answer due date 11/22/19. (Cordell, Annette)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Assented To Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. 6) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to the Complaint on or before November 22, 2019. Signed on 10/16/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file responsive pleading filed by Robert H. Bernstein on behalf of Stanley Steemer International, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bernstein, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Robert H. Bernstein on behalf of Stanley Steemer International, Inc. (Attorney Robert H. Bernstein added to party Stanley Steemer International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bernstein, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Lateef Runnels. Stanley Steemer International, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Dirks, Eric)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Courtney Marie Stout on behalf of Lateef Runnels (Attorney Courtney Marie Stout added to party Lateef Runnels(pty:pla))(Stout, Courtney)
September 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stanley Steemer International, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stanley Steemer International, Inc. filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of Lateef Runnels. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6500484. Service due by 12/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dirks, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runnels v. Stanley Steemer International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lateef Runnels
Represented By: Heather Jasmine Hardinger
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Represented By: Michael A Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Steemer International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?