Panini America, Inc. v. Wing
Plaintiff: Panini America, Inc.
Defendant: Shad Wing
Case Number: 4:2019cv00795
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/26/2019 as Document No. 12-1, Exhibit EXHIBIT A. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy christy_anderson@mow.uscourts.gov in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for order INJUNCTION filed by George H. Blosser on behalf of Panini America, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Blosser, George) Modified on 11/27/2019 please refer to the docket modification. (Kern, Kendra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of settlement Discussions and Request to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by Panini America, Inc. (Blosser, George)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Panini America, Inc.. Shad Wing served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Blosser, George)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion for TRO. Signed on 10/21/2019 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Kern, Kendra)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by George H. Blosser on behalf of Plaintiff Panini America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index EXHIBIT A)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Blosser, George)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for temporary restraining order filed by George H. Blosser on behalf of Panini America, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blosser, George)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 & #5 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Charles E. Phipps and Joseph A. Unis, Jr for Panini America, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to allow Joseph A. Unis, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6516771) filed by George H. Blosser on behalf of Panini America, Inc.. (Blosser, George)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to allow Charles E. Phipps to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6516719) filed by George H. Blosser on behalf of Panini America, Inc.. (Blosser, George)
October 1, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shad Wing. (Houston, Kiambu)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) 4,254,101; 2,755,819: 2,428,482. Plaintiff(s): Panini America, Inc. Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): George H. Blosser, Sandberg, Phoenix & von Gontard, PC-Clayton, 120 S. Central Avenue, Suite 1600, Clayton, MO 63105 Defendant(s): Shad Wing The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Houston, Kiambu)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6514723. Service due by 12/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Blosser, George) #2 Civil Cover Sheet). Modified on 10/1/2019 at the request of counsel civil cover sheet omitted at original filing. (Kern, Kendra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panini America, Inc. v. Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shad Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panini America, Inc.
Represented By: George H. Blosser
Represented By: Joseph A. Unis, Jr.
Represented By: Charles E. Phipps
Represented By: Philip Charles Graham
Represented By: Brett Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?