Bowers v. Green Light Window Films, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Martin Faith, Green Light Window Films, LLC and Mackie Beall
Case Number: 4:2019cv00828
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to strike #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Voytas, Richard)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Stephen Paul Horn on behalf of Defendants Mackie Beall, Martin Faith, Green Light Window Films, LLC.(Horn, Stephen)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney John M. Tanner for Mackie Beall, Martin Faith, and Green Light Window Films, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Mackie Beall served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/28/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 12/18/2019. Signed on 11/13/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Mackie Beall, Martin Faith, Green Light Window Films, LLC.(Horn, Stephen)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow John M. Tanner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6579280) filed by Stephen Paul Horn on behalf of All Defendants. (Attorney Stephen Paul Horn added to party Mackie Beall(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Paul Horn added to party Martin Faith(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Paul Horn added to party Green Light Window Films, LLC(pty:dft))(Horn, Stephen)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Green Light Window Films, LLC served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Martin Faith served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
October 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mackie Beall, Martin Faith, Green Light Window Films, LLC. (Ellis, Lindsey)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mackie Beall, Martin Faith, Green Light Window Films, LLC filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6535744. Service due by 1/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Green Light Window Films, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Faith
Represented By: John M. Tanner
Represented By: Stephen Paul Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Light Window Films, LLC
Represented By: John M. Tanner
Represented By: Stephen Paul Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackie Beall
Represented By: John M. Tanner
Represented By: Stephen Paul Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Ethan William Gee
Represented By: Nathan Kyle Bruns
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?