Colum v. Jackson County et al
Plaintiff: Candy Colum
Defendant: Joseph Piccinini, Unidentified Corrections Officer, MO Jackson County and City of Kansas City, Missouri
Case Number: 4:2019cv00842
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 34 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Plaintiff Candy Colum. Reply suggestions due by 12/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #14 ) (LaCroix, Anthony)
December 13, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Sarah Alderks Brown on behalf of Plaintiff Candy Colum.(Brown, Sarah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Joshua Neal Haner on behalf of Defendant MO Jackson County.(Haner, Joshua)
December 13, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Timothy R. Ertz on behalf of Defendant City of Kansas City, Missouri.(Ertz, Timothy)
December 13, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Oral Argument on Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss set for 1/23/2020, 3:00 PM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
December 11, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
December 10, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy R. Ertz on behalf of Defendant City of Kansas City, Missouri. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Ertz, Timothy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 28 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Candy Colum. (LaCroix, Anthony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION to remand filed by Joshua Neal Haner on behalf of Defendant MO Jackson County. Reply suggestions due by 12/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Haner, Joshua)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Defendants Jackson County's and Joseph Piccinini's #25 unopposed motion for leave to file suggestions in opposition to the motion to remand. Defendants shall file their suggestions in opposition within three business days. Signed on 12/9/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (El-Zein, Anna)
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for leave to file Suggestions in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Joshua Neal Haner on behalf of MO Jackson County. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Suggestions in Opposition)(Haner, Joshua)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Suggestions in Opposition to Defendants Jackson County, Missouri and Joseph Piccinini's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, up to and including December 20, 2019. Signed on 12/6/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming The Honorable Jay A. Daugherty(LaCroix, Anthony)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for extension of time (unopposed) to file Suggestions in Opposition to Jackson County and Joseph Piccinini's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Damages filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Candy Colum. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (LaCroix, Anthony)
December 4, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #11 MOTION to remand filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Plaintiff Candy Colum. (Related document(s) #11 ) (LaCroix, Anthony)
November 29, 2019 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Plaintiff Candy Colum. Reply suggestions due by 12/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (LaCroix, Anthony)
November 27, 2019 Filing 19 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #11 MOTION to remand filed by Emily Carney on behalf of Defendant City of Kansas City, Missouri. Reply suggestions due by 12/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Carney, Emily)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (City's Amended Suggestions) filed by Timothy R. Ertz on behalf of Defendant City of Kansas City, Missouri. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Ertz, Timothy)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Defendant City of Kansas City, Missouri's Motion for Leave to File Amended Suggestions in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition is GRANTED. The Amended Suggestions shall be filed by close of business on 11/26/19 as indicated in the Motion. Signed on 11/26/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to file Amended Suggestions in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Damages filed by Timothy R. Ertz on behalf of City of Kansas City, Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ertz, Timothy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joshua Neal Haner on behalf of Defendant MO Jackson County. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Haner, Joshua)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joshua Neal Haner on behalf of MO Jackson County. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Haner, Joshua)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of filing Consents to Removal by MO Jackson County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Email Chain)(Haner, Joshua)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION to remand filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Plaintiff Candy Colum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - email chain, #2 Exhibit B - declaration of counsel)(Related document(s) #11 ) (LaCroix, Anthony)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to remand filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Candy Colum. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (LaCroix, Anthony)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Robert Travis Willingham on behalf of MO Jackson County, Joseph Piccinini (Attorney Robert Travis Willingham added to party MO Jackson County(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Travis Willingham added to party Joseph Piccinini(pty:dft))(Willingham, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Suggestions in Opposition to Defendant City of Kansas City, Missouri's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Damages is GRANTED, up to and including November 29, 2019. Signed on 11/7/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file Suggestions in Opposition to Kansas City's Motion to Dismiss filed by Anthony E. LaCroix on behalf of Candy Colum. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (LaCroix, Anthony)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy R. Ertz on behalf of Defendant City of Kansas City, Missouri. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Ertz, Timothy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Timothy R. Ertz on behalf of City of Kansas City, Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ertz, Timothy)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant Jackson County, Missouri, and Joseph Piccinini's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading is GRANTED, up to and including November 25, 2019. Signed on 10/24/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time filed by Joshua Neal Haner on behalf of MO Jackson County. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Joshua Neal Haner added to party MO Jackson County(pty:dft))(Haner, Joshua)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/9/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/25/2019. Signed on 10/23/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-cv23331, filed by Timothy R. Ertz on behalf of City of Kansas City, Missouri. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6544705. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings)(Ertz, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colum v. Jackson County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Piccinini
Represented By: Joshua Neal Haner
Represented By: Robert Travis Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Corrections Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MO Jackson County
Represented By: Joshua Neal Haner
Represented By: Robert Travis Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kansas City, Missouri
Represented By: Timothy R. Ertz
Represented By: Emily Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candy Colum
Represented By: Anthony E. LaCroix
Represented By: Sarah Alderks Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?