Abrought v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Remy Abrought
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00860
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Mary M Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Remy Abrought.(Johnson, Mary)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Pretrial Conference via telephone to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel set for 3/11/2021 11:00 AM before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Jury Trial set for 3/22/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8A, Kansas City (GAF) before District Judge Gary A. Fenner. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020. Signed on 12/18/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 12/18/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed on 12/17/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/31/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (DeVeney, Jeannie)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Joe Eischens(DeVeney, Jeannie)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hy-Vee, Inc. filed by Jennifer Schorgl on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(Schorgl, Jennifer)
November 6, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/19/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 12/9/2019. Signed on 11/4/19 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc..(DeVeney, Jeannie)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Jackson County County, case number 1916-CV24436, filed by Jeannie M. DeVeney on behalf of Hy-Vee, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6555392. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeVeney, Jeannie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrought v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remy Abrought
Represented By: Mary M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Jeannie M. DeVeney
Represented By: Jennifer Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?