Hill v. First Federal Bank of Kansas City et al
Plaintiff: Erika Yvonne Hill
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and First Federal Bank of Kansas City
Case Number: 4:2019cv00885
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Referring Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of dismissal WITH FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF KANSAS CITY by Erika Yvonne Hill. (Herring, Chelsea)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement #15 with defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC and the Notice of Settlement #16 with defendant First Federal Bank of Kansas City, the parties are directed to file either Stipulations of Dismissal or a Joint Status Report discussing settlement progress on or before 1/23/2020. Signed on 12/9/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of settlement WITH FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF KANSAS CITY by Erika Yvonne Hill (Herring, Chelsea)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of settlement WITH EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by Erika Yvonne Hill (Herring, Chelsea)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 12/4/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts to District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Please note the new case number: 19-885-CV-W-FJG. (Melvin, Greg)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for both defendants. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 12/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER granting #11 Equifax Information Services LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC's answer or other responsive pleading due on or before 12/30/2019. Signed on December 2, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due on or before 1/14/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 12/31/2019. Signed on November 26, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORAL ORDER granting #8 Defendant First Federal Bank of Kansas City's First Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading. Defendant First Federal Bank of Kansas City's answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before 12/30/2019. Signed on November 26, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher Helt on behalf of First Federal Bank of Kansas City. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Helt, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher Helt on behalf of Defendant First Federal Bank of Kansas City.(Helt, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher Helt on behalf of First Federal Bank of Kansas City (Attorney Christopher Helt added to party First Federal Bank of Kansas City(pty:dft))(Helt, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Thomas Marvin Martin on behalf of First Federal Bank of Kansas City (Attorney Thomas Marvin Martin added to party First Federal Bank of Kansas City(pty:dft))(Martin, Thomas)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Erika Yvonne Hill. First Federal Bank of Kansas City served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Herring, Chelsea)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Erika Yvonne Hill. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Herring, Chelsea)
November 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, First Federal Bank of Kansas City. (Kern, Kendra)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/25/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. Emailed to Plaintiff's counsel.(Kern, Kendra)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, First Federal Bank of Kansas City filed by Chelsea S Herring on behalf of Erika Yvonne Hill. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6567337. Service due by 2/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herring, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. First Federal Bank of Kansas City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Guillermo G. Zorogastua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Bank of Kansas City
Represented By: Thomas Marvin Martin
Represented By: Christopher Helt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Yvonne Hill
Represented By: Chelsea S Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?