Wall v. First Federal Bank of Kansas City et al
Plaintiff: Liza Lucille Wall
Defendant: Trans Union LLC, Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, First Federal Bank of Kansas City, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Citizens Bank, N.A. dba Citizens One Auto Finance
Case Number: 4:2019cv00888
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
December 27, 2019 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for extension of time TO FILE PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER FOR 14 DAYS filed by Chelsea S Herring on behalf of Liza Lucille Wall. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Herring, Chelsea)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation.(Sullivan, Christian)
December 19, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of settlement WITH CITIZENS BANK, N.A. by Liza Lucille Wall (Herring, Chelsea)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Christian Sullivan for Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
December 17, 2019 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
December 17, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to allow Christian A. Sullivan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6632642) filed by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. (Stephens, Robert)
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION of dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH TRANS UNION LLC by Liza Lucille Wall. (Herring, Chelsea)
December 4, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/2/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 12/19/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 12/2/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #16) is, with Plaintiff having no objection, GRANTED. Equifax shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before December 30, 2019. Signed on 11/27/2019 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Guillermo G. Zorogastua on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Guillermo G. Zorogastua added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES on behalf of Trans Union LLC.(Brown, Terri)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/22/2019 as Document No. 14.1, Proposed Order. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time To File Responsive Pleadings filed by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stephens, Robert) Modified on 11/25/2019 please refer to docket modification. (Kern, Kendra)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Robert William Stephens on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Attorney Robert William Stephens added to party Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation(pty:dft))(Stephens, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Terri R Brown for Trans Union LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Judge Beth Phillips, this case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:19-00888-CV-W-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Martin, Jan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Terri R. Brown to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6579218) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Lubben, Todd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Lubben, Todd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Liza Lucille Wall. Trans Union LLC served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Herring, Chelsea)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Liza Lucille Wall. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Herring, Chelsea)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Liza Lucille Wall. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt)(Herring, Chelsea)
November 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Citizens Bank, N.A. dba Citizens One Auto Finance, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, Trans Union LLC. (Kern, Kendra)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT TO CORRECT ATTACHMENTS against Citizens Bank, N.A. dba Citizens One Auto Finance, Equifax Information Services, LLC, First Federal Bank of Kansas City, Trans Union LLC filed by Chelsea S Herring on behalf of Liza Lucille Wall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - A - L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herring, Chelsea)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Citizens Bank, N.A. dba Citizens One Auto Finance, Equifax Information Services, LLC, First Federal Bank of Kansas City, Trans Union LLC filed by Chelsea S Herring on behalf of Liza Lucille Wall.(Herring, Chelsea)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizens Bank, N.A. dba Citizens One Auto Finance, Equifax Information Services, LLC, First Federal Bank of Kansas City, Trans Union LLC filed by Chelsea S Herring on behalf of Liza Lucille Wall. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6568000. Service due by 2/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - L, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herring, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. First Federal Bank of Kansas City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Lucille Wall
Represented By: Chelsea S Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Terri R Brown
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Christian A. Sullivan
Represented By: Robert William Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Bank of Kansas City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Guillermo G. Zorogastua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A. dba Citizens One Auto Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?