Eichman v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Eichman
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-S1 and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00903
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Paul K. Hentzen on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Eichman.(Hentzen, Paul)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 10:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 12/16/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Protective Order, #2 Supplement ESI Plan)(Hentzen, Paul)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 12/19/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/2/2020. Signed on 11/19/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Eichman Opening discovery to PHH filed by Paul K. Hentzen on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Eichman.(Hentzen, Paul)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-S1.(Holdmeyer, Sarah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Sarah Holdmeyer on behalf of Defendants PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-S1.(Holdmeyer, Sarah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-cv26547, filed by Sarah Holdmeyer on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-S1, PHH Mortgage Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6576861. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Holdmeyer, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eichman v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for Structured Asset Securities Corporation Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-S1
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Represented By: Sarah Holdmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Eichman
Represented By: Paul K. Hentzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?