Campo v. U.S. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Robert Campo
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 4:2019cv00905
Filed: November 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Campo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 email to to DOJ 8/20/2019 re: Powers' email, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter to DOJ 8/20/2019 re: Powers' email, #3 Exhibit 3 Campo's FOIA Request 2/19/2019, #4 Exhibit 4 DOJ Denial 2/27/2019, #5 Exhibit 5 DOJ Denial 7/2/2019)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Jordan, Jack)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant U.S. Department of Justice. Reply suggestions due by 12/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Ray, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice.(Ray, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to reassign/transfer case MOTION to stay filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Plaintiff Robert Campo. Reply suggestions due by 12/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/9/2019 at the request of filer, original document contained an error; NEF regenerated) (Ellis, Lindsey).
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to reassign/transfer case , MOTION to stay filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Attorney Jeffrey P. Ray added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft))(Ray, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Robert Campo. U.S. Department of Justice served on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attorney 11/15/2019, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service US Attorney General 11/13/2019, #3 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attorney General 11/19/2019)(Jordan, Jack)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Robert Campo. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Facts & Suggestions, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jack Jordan)(Jordan, Jack)
November 12, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Kern, Kendra)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Cynthia A. Norton. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice filed by Jack Jordan on behalf of Robert Campo. Filing fee $400, receipt number MOWDC-6577248. Service due by 2/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Huber's email and Powers' email (redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 Letter 10/28/2015 from DI to ALJ Merck, #4 Exhibit 3 DI Opp 1/16/2018 (excerpts), #5 Exhibit 4 Huber's Declaration 8/15/2017)(Jordan, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campo v. U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Campo
Represented By: Jack Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?