Maurella v. H&R Block, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmen J. Maurella, III
Defendant: H&R Block Tax Services LLC and H&R Block Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00909
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 58 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-07435.
November 13, 2019 Filing 57 TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Missouri the electronic record. (kp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to transfer is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Defendants' unopposed motions to transfer each of the above-captioned matters to the Western District of Missouri pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 is granted as to all cases. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on May 29, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to supplement #53 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENT to response in opposition to motion, #51 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY by H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #51 , MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 #41 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott W. Andreasen, #2 Declaration of Michael I Rothstein)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE by Carmen J. Maurella, IIIin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 #41 (Miller, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to reassign case #48 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, March 29, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion to reassign case, #48 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/29/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION by Defendant H&R Block Tax Services LLC to reassign case Defendant's Agreed Motion to Reassign Case as Related Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Benson Complaint, #2 Exhibit Maurella Complaint, #3 Exhibit Griffith Complaint, #4 Exhibit Vazquez-Rivera Complaint, #5 Exhibit Robinson Complaint, #6 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 3/8/19 before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Motion hearing. Order Number: 34024. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Renke, OfficialTranscript@gmail.com, 312.435.6053. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019. (Renke, Laura) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 01-18-2019 before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Order Number: 33447. Court Reporter Contact Information: Pamela S. Warren http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/transcript-order-form.aspx.

< Redaction Request due 4/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019. (Warren, Pamela) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Scott W. Andreasen regarding motion to compel, #41 (Corrected Exhibits) (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Michael I Rothstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion hearing held on 3/8/2019. Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc., or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue #41 is due on or before 4/5/2019. Defendants' reply is due on or before 4/26/2019. Leave is granted to file briefs in excess of 15 pages. Counsel may submit an agreed order regarding briefing schedules in related cases. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion to compel, #41 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 3/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to compel Arbitration on an Individual Basis and/or to Dismiss H&R Block, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Scott W. Andreasen, #2 Declaration Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by Eric S. Hochstadt (Hochstadt, Eric) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by David Jason Lender (Lender, David) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to appear pro hac vice #33 is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #35 is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Motion to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, February 22,2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #13 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #35 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15506390. on behalf of Eric S. Hochstadt (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #33 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15506273. on behalf of David J. Lender (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to Sequence Defendants' Responsive Pleadings #30 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, February 15, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #30 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 2/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to set a briefing schedule Sequencing Defendants' Responsive Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER. Signed by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Mailed notice. (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to reassign cases #26 is granted. Motion hearing held on 1/18/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion to reassign case, #26 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaints Pending a Decision By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation #23 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 11, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to complaint #1 (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for leave to file excess pages #19 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 4, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #19 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDMENT TO THE HEARING SESSION ORDER - AND ATTACHED SCHEDULE FILED 12/13/18 re: MDL No. 2880 signed by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 to Reassign Case as Related Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 12/7/2018. Mailed notice (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time #8 is granted. Motion to reassign case #10 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 7, 2018. Mailed notice (ewf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by Uriel B. Abt (Abt, Uriel) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by Timothy A. Hudson (Hudson, Timothy) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15245942. (Gilman, Stacey) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Mark Richard Miller for presentment of motion to reassign case #10 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/7/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Miller, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Carmen J. Maurella, III in support of motion to reassign case #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Carmen J. Maurella, III to reassign case as Related (Miller, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Michael I. Rothstein for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/7/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. for extension of time to Respond to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. by Michael I. Rothstein (Rothstein, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15175569. (Williams, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15169009. (Saveri, Joseph) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15168908. (Chen, Jiamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
November 9, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants H&R Block Tax Services LLC, H&R Block, Inc. (ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carmen J. Maurella, III by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Carmen J. Maurella, III by Mark Richard Miller (Miller, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
November 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carmen J. Maurella, III; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15163918. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Mark) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maurella v. H&R Block, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Tax Services LLC
Represented By: David J Lender
Represented By: Uriel B. Abt
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Represented By: Michael I. Rothstein
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Timothy A. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Inc
Represented By: David J Lender
Represented By: Uriel B. Abt
Represented By: Stacey R. Gilman
Represented By: Michael I. Rothstein
Represented By: Eric Shaun Hochstadt
Represented By: Timothy A. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen J. Maurella, III
Represented By: Steven N. Williams
Represented By: Jiamin Chen
Represented By: R. Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?