Adams v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Adams
Defendant: Rene Jiminez and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00913
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Stephen J. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Adams. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Moore, Stephen)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2020. Status Report due by 6/5/2020. Trial to be set by future order. Please see text of order for additional deadlines. Signed on 1/6/2020 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Stephanie Adams. (Nugent, Ivan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Dismiss Count III (Assault) of the Amended Petition for Damages) ; Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Dismiss Count III (Assault) #12 filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Millman, Timothy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Michelle Minor(Nugent, Ivan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Chad G Gardner on behalf of Defendant Rene Jiminez.(Gardner, Chad)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy)
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company. Reply suggestions due by 1/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Millman, Timothy)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ivan Nugent on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Adams.(Nugent, Ivan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Dismiss Count III (Assault) of the Amended Petition for Damages) filed by Stephen J. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Adams. Reply suggestions due by 1/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Moore, Stephen)
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to remand filed by Stephen J. Moore on behalf of Plaintiff Stephanie Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collins Proposed First Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Huskey Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Hoaglin Proposed Second Amended Petition)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Moore, Stephen)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to remand filed by Stephen J. Moore on behalf of Stephanie Adams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Stephen J. Moore added to party Stephanie Adams(pty:pla))(Moore, Stephen)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - GRANTING #8 plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file response/reply re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Plaintiff's Suggestions in opposition/response is due on or before 12/20/2019. Upon consent of the parties, defendant's reply suggestions will be due on or before 1/10/2020. Signed on 12/5/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Dismiss Count III (Assault) of the Amended Petition for Damages) filed by Ivan Nugent on behalf of Stephanie Adams. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Nugent, Ivan) Modified on 12/5/2019 at the request of counsel to correctly name pleading. (Kern, Kendra)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Dismiss Count III (Assault) of the Amended Petition for Damages) filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Millman, Timothy)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Dismiss Count III (Assault) of the Amended Petition for Damages) filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/4/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Millman, Timothy)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Damages (Dkt. #1-2) on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Millman, Timothy)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 11/14/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kern, Kendra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri County, case number 19CY-CV09854, filed by Timothy S. Millman on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6581913. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Millman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Jiminez
Represented By: Chad G Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Timothy S. Millman
Represented By: Kathleen M Nemechek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Adams
Represented By: Lara Pabst
Represented By: Ivan Nugent
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?