Krott v. New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Maria Krott
Defendant: New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00915
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 , #8 ,& #9 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Douglas M. Werman, Maureen A. Salas, and Sarah J Arendt for Maria Krott allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to allow Sarah J. Arendt to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6633706) filed by Rowdy B. Meeks on behalf of Maria Krott. (Meeks, Rowdy)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to allow Maureen A. Salas to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6633704) filed by Rowdy B. Meeks on behalf of Maria Krott. (Meeks, Rowdy)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow Douglas S. Werman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6633695) filed by Rowdy B. Meeks on behalf of Maria Krott. (Meeks, Rowdy)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C.'s responsive pleading is due 1/24/2020. Signed on 12/17/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Kyle B. Russell added to party New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Russell, Kyle)
November 30, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Maria Krott. New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Meeks, Rowdy)
November 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C.. (Kern, Kendra)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consent to Join Litigation by Maria Krott (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Join)(Meeks, Rowdy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C. filed by Rowdy B. Meeks on behalf of Maria Krott. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6582184. Service due by 2/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A FLSA Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meeks, Rowdy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krott v. New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Directions Behavioral Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Phillip C. Thompson
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Krott
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Douglas M. Werman
Represented By: Sarah J Arendt
Represented By: Maureen A. Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?