Wild v. Rockwell Labs, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Alexander L. Wild
Defendant: Rockwell Labs, LTD and Dr. Cisse Spragins
Case Number: 4:2019cv00919
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2020. Status Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:30 AM; Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2021 01:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2021 01:30 PM; and Jury Trial set for 2/22/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8E, Kansas City (RK) before District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. Signed on April 27, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
April 24, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Defendants Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins.(Kernell, James)
April 24, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins.(Kernell, James)
April 23, 2020 Filing 28 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Alexander L. Wild. (Voytas, Richard)
April 23, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins of Defendants' First Requests for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-42) filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Defendants Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins.(Kernell, James)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Signed on 04/20/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (BC)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. Plaintiff advised the Court in his #18 proposed scheduling order that Defendants did not consent to scheduling order deadlines due to their request to stay the case. Defendants' motion to stay has now been denied (Doc. #22 ). The Court directs the parties to submit a joint proposed scheduling order by 4/24/2020. Signed on 4/17/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Phillips, Caleb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alexander L. Wild filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander L. Wild.(Voytas, Richard)
April 16, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander L. Wild.(Voytas, Richard)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #15 motion to stay. Signed on 04/16/2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (BC)
April 15, 2020 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Cheryl Burbach(Voytas, Richard)
April 15, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #15 MOTION to stay filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Defendants Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Kernell, James)
April 9, 2020 Filing 19 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Cheryl Burbach(Voytas, Richard)
April 3, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Alexander L. Wild. (Voytas, Richard)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #15 MOTION to stay filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander L. Wild. Reply suggestions due by 4/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Voytas, Richard)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 SUGGESTIONS in support re #15 MOTION to stay filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Defendants Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Second Amended Order 20-01)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Kernell, James)
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to stay filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Kernell, James)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 3/20/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/3/2020. Signed on February 19, 2020 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Defendants Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Kernell, James)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Alexander L. Wild. Reply suggestions due by 1/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Voytas, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 unopposed motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's suggestions in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss is due 1/15/2020. Signed on 12/20/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Phillips, Caleb)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Alexander L. Wild. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Voytas, Richard)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Defendants Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Spragins Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2: Crowell Declaration, #3 Exhibit A: Screen shots, #4 Exhibit B: Screen shots, #5 Exhibit C: License term, #6 Exhibit D: Email from C. Springs to R. Voytas dated 11/1/2019, #7 Exhibit E: Email from J. Crowell to C. Spragins dated 5/21/2019, 12:33 pm, #8 Exhibit F: Website w/o copyright notice, #9 Exhibit G: Email from J. Crowell to C. Spragins dated 5/21/2019, 1:58 am, #10 Exhibit H: Email from J. Crowell to C. Spragins, dated 5/21/2019, 1:58 am, #11 Exhibit I: Email from J. Crowell to C. Spragins dated 5/21/2019, 12:20 pm, #12 Exhibit J: Email from J. Crowell to C. Spragins, dated 5/21/2019, 12:20 pm, #13 Exhibit K: Email from J. Crowell to C. Spragins dated 5/21/2019, 12:29 pm, #14 Exhibit L: Letter from R. Voytas to C. Spragins dated 10/10/2019)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Kernell, James)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James J. Kernell on behalf of Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney James J. Kernell added to party Rockwell Labs, LTD(pty:dft), Attorney James J. Kernell added to party Cisse Spragins(pty:dft))(Kernell, James)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Alexander L. Wild. Cisse Spragins served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Alexander L. Wild. Rockwell Labs, LTD served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Voytas, Richard)
November 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rockwell Labs, LTD, Cisse Spragins. (Ellis, Lindsey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ***Remark*** AO 121 Form and Complaint. Hard Copy of document has been mailed to the address listed on the AO 121 form. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Ellis, Lindsey)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Alexander L. Wild (Voytas, Richard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Alexander L. Wild (Voytas, Richard)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Alexander L. Wild. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6585187. Service due by 2/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild v. Rockwell Labs, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Labs, LTD
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Represented By: Kyle Duffy Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cisse Spragins
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Represented By: Kyle Duffy Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Alexander L. Wild
Represented By: Nathan Kyle Bruns
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?