American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. v. Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Defendant: Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C. and Joy L. Alderson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00927
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Dennis J Cassidy on behalf of Defendant Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C., Counter Claimant Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C..(Cassidy, Dennis)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher A. Brackman on behalf of Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Brackman, Christopher)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/21/2020. Signed on 1/6/20 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Anderson, Christy)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment of Defendant Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C.'s on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Brackman, Christopher)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Joy L. Alderson's Answer to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment on behalf of Joy L. Alderson.(Attorney Daniel Singer added to party Joy L. Alderson(pty:dft))(Singer, Daniel)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. on behalf of Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C..(Attorney Dennis J Cassidy added to party Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C.(pty:dft))(Cassidy, Dennis)
November 21, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C.. (Woods, Gloria)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joy L. Alderson, Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C. filed by Christopher A. Brackman on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6591324. Service due by 2/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Policy, #3 Exhibit Policy Declarations)(Brackman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. v. Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Chiropractic, P.C.
Represented By: Dennis J Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy L. Alderson
Represented By: Ashley Billam
Represented By: Daniel Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Christopher A. Brackman
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?