Morrow v. Kansas City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Junius R Morrow
Defendant: Michael Wells, Mahoney, Stephan Hughes and Kansas City Police Department
Case Number: 4:2019cv00929
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time in which to pay the initial partial filing fee (Doc. #8 ) is granted, in that Plaintiff shall pay the initial partial filing fee on or before January 22, 2020. No further extensions of time will be granted absent a clear demonstration of extraordinary circumstances. Failure to pay the initial partial filing fee will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on January 8, 2020 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for extension of time to pay initial partial filing fee filed by Junius R Morrow. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/22/2020. (Davies, Cindy)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that, because Plaintiff has not paid the $40.83 initial partial filing fee ordered by the Court (Doc. #5 ), Plaintiff shall show cause, on or before January 16, 2020, as to why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's Orders. Plaintiff's failure to comply will result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on January 2, 2020 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Davies, Cindy)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT as directed by 12/4/19 order (Doc. #5 ) filed by Junius R Morrow. (CLERK'S NOTE: The complaint was written lightly in pencil, the clerk attempted to darken the document with limited success and a few words are illegible.)(Davies, Cindy) Modified on 12/26/2019 (Davies, Cindy).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $40.83; (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (4) Plaintiff is directed to file a single superseding amended complaint, as specifically discussed herein; and (5) Plaintiff's failure to both pay the required initial partial filing fee and amend as directed, on or before December 26, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on December 4, 2019 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Junius R Morrow. (Davies, Cindy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Junius R Morrow. (Davies, Cindy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Junius R Morrow. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Kansas City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junius R Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?