McCarthy v. Jackson County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Ian McCarthy
Defendant: Jackson County Detention Center
Case Number: 4:2019cv00936
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this is case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must comply with the Court's previous orders. (Davies, Cindy)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: ORDERED that this is case is dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's orders. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must comply with the Court's previous orders. Signed on December 20, 2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Davies, Cindy)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis, (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the Clerk of the Court for the Western District of Missouri an initial partial filing fee of $0.66 on or before December 17, 2019, if he seeks to proceed with this case; (2) Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint as set forth herein on or before December 17, 2019, or his case will be dismissed without further notice; and (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint. Signed on December 4, 2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Ian McCarthy. (Davies, Cindy)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed on November 22, 2019 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Davies, Cindy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for appointment of counsel filed by Ian McCarthy. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/6/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Ian McCarthy. (Davies, Cindy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jackson County Detention Center filed by Ian McCarthy. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Jackson County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?