Albritton v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Dymond Albritton
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00988
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2021 10:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 4/30/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 1/23/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ivan Nugent on behalf of Plaintiff Dymond Albritton.(Nugent, Ivan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Megan Costello on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Costello, Megan)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Dymond Albritton. (Nugent, Ivan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Joe Eischens(Nugent, Ivan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS by Defendant Ford Motor Company filed by Megan Costello on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Costello, Megan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Ford Motor Company.(Costello, Megan)
December 11, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/10/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/24/2020. Signed on 12/10/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri County, case number 19CY-CV11010, filed by Kathleen M Nemechek on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6621632. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nemechek, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albritton v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Kathleen M Nemechek
Represented By: Megan Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dymond Albritton
Represented By: Lara Pabst
Represented By: Ivan Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?