YETI Coolers, LLC v. Yetiflage, LLC
Plaintiff: YETI Coolers, LLC
Defendant: Yetiflage, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00996
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer/responsive pleading is due 2/21/20. Signed on 1/29/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Martin, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of Yetiflage, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Burbach, Cheryl)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer. Defendant's answer/responsive pleading is due 2/7/2020. Signed on 1/10/20 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dollar, Jordan) Modified on 1/13/2020 (Dollar, Jordan).
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of Yetiflage, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/23/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Burbach, Cheryl)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Cheryl Lynn Burbach on behalf of Yetiflage, LLC (Attorney Cheryl Lynn Burbach added to party Yetiflage, LLC(pty:dft))(Burbach, Cheryl)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by YETI Coolers, LLC. Yetiflage, LLC served on 12/27/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (Tompkins, Benjamin)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 , #6 ,& #7 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Joseph J. Berghammer, Michael L. Krashin, and Anthony J. Denis for YETI Coolers, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow Anthony J. Denis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6641789) filed by Benjamin L. Tompkins on behalf of YETI Coolers, LLC. (Tompkins, Benjamin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to allow Michael L. Krashin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6641783) filed by Benjamin L. Tompkins on behalf of YETI Coolers, LLC. (Tompkins, Benjamin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to allow Joseph J. Berghammer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6641777) filed by Benjamin L. Tompkins on behalf of YETI Coolers, LLC. (Tompkins, Benjamin)
December 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yetiflage, LLC. (Houston, Kiambu)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Plaintiff YETI Coolers, LLC filed by Benjamin L. Tompkins on behalf of Plaintiff YETI Coolers, LLC.(Tompkins, Benjamin)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) 3,203,869 - 4,948,370 - 4,948,371 - 5,341,587 - 5,521,939 - 5,438,798 - 5,601,737. Plaintiff(s): YETI Coolers, LLC Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Benjamin L. Tompkins, Kennyhertz Perry, LLC 2000 Shawnee Mission Parkway Ste 210 Mission Woods, KS 66205 Defendant(s): Yetiflage, LLC The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-7) (Woods, Gloria)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yetiflage, LLC filed by Benjamin L. Tompkins on behalf of YETI Coolers, LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6625005. Service due by 3/11/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration No. 3,203,869, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration No. 4,948,370, #3 Exhibit 3 - Registration No. 4,948,371, #4 Exhibit 4 - Registration No. 5,341,587, #5 Exhibit 5 - Registration No. 5,521,939, #6 Exhibit 6 - Registration No. 5,438,798, #7 Exhibit 7 - Registration No. 5,601,737, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tompkins, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YETI Coolers, LLC v. Yetiflage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YETI Coolers, LLC
Represented By: Jon Dedon
Represented By: Benjamin L. Tompkins
Represented By: Anthony J. Denis
Represented By: Joseph J. Berghammer
Represented By: Michael L. Krashin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yetiflage, LLC
Represented By: Cheryl Lynn Burbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?