Burkes v. Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joe W Burkes
Defendant: Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01005
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc. filed by Michael L. Matula on behalf of Defendant Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc..(Matula, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.. (Matula, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anne Hershewe on behalf of Defendant Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc..(Hershewe, Anne)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/21/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 1/8/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Petition for Damages on behalf of Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc..(Hershewe, Anne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal with the Circuit Court of Saline County, Missouri by Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hershewe, Anne)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Bankruptcy Judge Brian T. Fenimore. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Saline County County, case number 19-SA-CV00892, Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6627879. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hershewe, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burkes v. Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coreslab Structures Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Matula
Represented By: Anne Hershewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe W Burkes
Represented By: Gerald Gray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?