Bowers v. Cofran et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Daniel R Cofran and Daniel R. Cofran, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01018
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Daniel R. Cofran, LLC served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
January 24, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Defendants' counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 2/14/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Willis, Kathy)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint for Copyright Infringement on behalf of Daniel R Cofran, Daniel R. Cofran, LLC.(Attorney Daniel R Cofran added to party Daniel R Cofran(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel R Cofran added to party Daniel R. Cofran, LLC(pty:dft))(Cofran, Daniel)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Daniel R Cofran served on 1/1/2020, answer due 1/22/2020. (Voytas, Richard)
December 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daniel R Cofran, Daniel R. Cofran, LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 20, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 1/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6639116. Service due by 3/19/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Cofran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R Cofran
Represented By: Daniel R Cofran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R. Cofran, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Cofran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?