Rundquist v. Hackley et al
Plaintiff: Scott Gregory Rundquist
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Kozeny & McCubbin LC, Auction.com, Substitute Trustee Corp., Weber & Associates, James Hackley, Pulaski Bank, National Association, BB&T Corp. and Martin Leigh PC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01023
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/2/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2020. Teleconference set for 3/12/2021, 2:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2021 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Bench Trial set for 4/5/2021, 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 2/19/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Scheduling Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 2/19/20 to Scott Gregory Rundquist, 410 Dickenson Rd., Independence, MO 64050. (Cordell, Annette)
February 13, 2020 Filing 35 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Staley, Christopher)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have until and including February 21, 2020, to respond to the motion and show cause why it should not be granted. Signed on 2/7/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 2/7/20 to Scott Gregory Rundquist, 410 Dickenson Rd., Independence MO 64050. (Cordell, Annette)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Attorney Mark Haddad's Motion to withdraw as Attorney for Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corp and Martin Leigh PC is GRANTED. Signed on 2/6/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #5 , #8 , #9 , #11 , #13 , and #16 . Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed on 2/6/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 2/6/20 to Scott Gregory Rundquist, 410 Dicksenson Rd., Independence MO 64050. (Cordell, Annette)
February 4, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Freddie Mac and Martin Leigh filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Martin Leigh PC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Haddad, Mark)
February 4, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of appearance by Beverly M. Weber on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Martin Leigh PC (Attorney Beverly M. Weber added to party Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Beverly M. Weber added to party Martin Leigh PC(pty:dft))(Weber, Beverly)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Attorney Steven D. Hall's motion to withdraw as attorney is GRANTED. Signed on 1/24/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
January 24, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Steven D. Hall on behalf of Pulaski Bank, National Association. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hall, Steven)
January 20, 2020 Filing 27 SUGGESTIONS in support re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Edward Bordeau on behalf of Defendant Pulaski Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Bordeau, John)
January 20, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Edward Bordeau on behalf of Pulaski Bank, National Association. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/3/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bordeau, John)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff has up to and including January 30, 2020 to respond to the motions to dismiss (Docs. 5, 8, 9, 11, 13, 16), and show cause why they should not be granted. Signed on 1/14/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 1/14/20 to Scott Gregory Rundquist, 410 Dickerson Rd., Independence, MO 64050. (Cordell, Annette)
January 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher R Staley on behalf of Pulaski Bank, National Association (Attorney Christopher R Staley added to party Pulaski Bank, National Association(pty:dft))(Staley, Christopher)
January 14, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of appearance by John Edward Bordeau on behalf of Pulaski Bank, National Association (Attorney John Edward Bordeau added to party Pulaski Bank, National Association(pty:dft))(Bordeau, John)
January 13, 2020 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Steven D. Hall on behalf of Defendant Pulaski Bank, National Association.(Hall, Steven)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of appearance by John G. Sommer on behalf of James Hackley (Attorney John G. Sommer added to party James Hackley(pty:dft))(Sommer, John)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #4 Defendant Pulaski Bank shall have until and including January 21, 2020, to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed on 1/10/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 1/10/20 to Scott Gregory Rundquist, 410 Dickenson Rd., Independence, MO 64050. (Cordell, Annette)
January 8, 2020 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation.(Haddad, Mark)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of Defendant Martin Leigh PC.(Haddad, Mark)
January 6, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anna M. Berman on behalf of Defendant Auction.com.(Berman, Anna)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to amend/correct #8 Joint MOTION to dismiss case for failure to state a claim filed by Matthew Tillma on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corp.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit Supplemental memorandum of law in support of motion to dismiss and supporting exhibits)(Related document(s) #8 ) (Tillma, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jeffrey A Harris, Jr on behalf of Defendant BB&T Corp..(Harris, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey A Harris, Jr on behalf of Defendant BB&T Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Return of Service)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Harris, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey A Harris, Jr on behalf of BB&T Corp.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Harris, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Jeffrey A Harris, Jr on behalf of BB&T Corp. (Attorney Jeffrey A Harris, Jr added to party BB&T Corp.(pty:dft))(Harris, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mark Haddad on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Martin Leigh PC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Haddad, Mark)
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anna M. Berman on behalf of Defendant Auction.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Petition, Case No. 1916-CV15101, #2 Exhibit B - Document Number 2019E0073975, #3 Exhibit C - Petition, Case No. 1916-CV25407, #4 Exhibit D - Verified Affidavit of Adverse Claim, #5 Exhibit E - Petition, Case No. 1916-CV29380, #6 Exhibit F - Certificate of Mailing)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Berman, Anna)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Anna M. Berman on behalf of Auction.com. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Anna M. Berman added to party Auction.com(pty:dft))(Berman, Anna)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to dismiss case filed by Matthew Tillma on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corp.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendant Kozeny & McCubbin, LC and Substitute Trustee Corporations' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Tillma, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Matthew Tillma on behalf of Substitute Trustee Corp. (Attorney Matthew Tillma added to party Substitute Trustee Corp.(pty:dft))(Tillma, Matthew)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 2/13/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 1/30/2020. Signed on 12/30/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order-Rule 16 was mailed via regular US mail on 12/30/19 to Scott Gregory Rundquist, 410 Dickenson Rd., Independence, MO 64050. (Cordell, Annette)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to dismiss case filed by Matthew Tillma on behalf of Kozeny & McCubbin LC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Matthew Tillma added to party Kozeny & McCubbin LC(pty:dft))(Tillma, Matthew)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for extension of time to file answer or Responsive Pleading filed by Steven D. Hall on behalf of Pulaski Bank, National Association. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hall, Steven)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Steven D. Hall on behalf of Pulaski Bank, National Association (Attorney Steven D. Hall added to party Pulaski Bank, National Association(pty:dft))(Hall, Steven)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Houston, Kiambu)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-CV29380, Martin Leigh PC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6641498. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haddad, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rundquist v. Hackley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Mark Haddad
Represented By: Thomas J. Fritzlen, Jr.
Represented By: Beverly M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kozeny & McCubbin LC
Represented By: Matthew Tillma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auction.com
Represented By: Anna M. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee Corp.
Represented By: Matthew Tillma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weber & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hackley
Represented By: John G. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski Bank, National Association
Represented By: John Edward Bordeau
Represented By: Christopher R Staley
Represented By: Steven D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey A Harris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Leigh PC
Represented By: Mark Haddad
Represented By: Thomas J. Fritzlen, Jr.
Represented By: Beverly M. Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Gregory Rundquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?