Freck et al v. Cerner Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Muserelli, Gloria Robinson, Jaleeza Owens and Barbara Jane Freck
Defendant: John Does 1-30, Cerner Corporation, Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors, Marc G. Naughton, Linda M. Dillman, George A. Riedel, Julie L. Gerberding, Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee, William D. Zollars and Halsey Wise
Case Number: 4:2020cv00043
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 motion for extension of time. Signed on 3/16/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
March 12, 2020 Filing 21 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jessica L Pixler on behalf of Defendant Cerner Corporation.(Pixler, Jessica)
March 10, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for extension of time to respond to complaint and to set briefing schedule filed by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of Cerner Corporation, Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee, Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/24/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Leopold, Christopher)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Donald R. Reavey for plaintiffs allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 9, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to allow Donald R. Reavey to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6766130) filed by Kristie Blunt Welder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Welder, Kristie)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 & #15 motions to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Michael S Hines & James R Carroll for Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee and Cerner Corporation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 ***Remark: The Court acknowledges Doc. #8 the parties' Joint STIPULATION of dismissal Without Prejudice of Individually Named Defendants: Linda M. Dillman, Julie L. Gerberding, George A. Riedel, Halsey Wise, William D. Zollars, Marc G. Naughton, and John does 1-30. (Baldwin, Joella)
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to allow Michael Hines to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6749368) filed by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of All Defendants. (Leopold, Christopher)
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to allow James Carroll to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6749363) filed by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of All Defendants. (Leopold, Christopher)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/27/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 3/13/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 2/26/2020 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica L Pixler on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party Cerner Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party Linda M. Dillman(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party John Does 1-30(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party Julie L. Gerberding(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party Marc G. Naughton(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party George A. Riedel(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party Halsey Wise(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica L Pixler added to party William D. Zollars(pty:dft))(Pixler, Jessica)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Cerner Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Linda M. Dillman(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party John Does 1-30(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Julie L. Gerberding(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Marc G. Naughton(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party George A. Riedel(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Halsey Wise(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party William D. Zollars(pty:dft))(Leopold, Christopher)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Sara Elizabeth Welch on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party Cerner Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party Linda M. Dillman(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party John Does 1-30(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party Julie L. Gerberding(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party Marc G. Naughton(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party George A. Riedel(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party Halsey Wise(pty:dft), Attorney Sara Elizabeth Welch added to party William D. Zollars(pty:dft))(Welch, Sara)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Scott C. Hecht on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party Cerner Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party Linda M. Dillman(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party John Does 1-30(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party Julie L. Gerberding(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party Marc G. Naughton(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party George A. Riedel(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party Halsey Wise(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Hecht added to party William D. Zollars(pty:dft))(Hecht, Scott)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of dismissal Joint Stipulation Regarding Dismissal Without Prejudice of Individually Named Defendants by Cerner Corporation, Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee, Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors, Linda M. Dillman, John Does 1-30, Julie L. Gerberding, Marc G. Naughton, George A. Riedel, Halsey Wise, William D. Zollars. (Hecht, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Jaleeza Owens, Gloria Robinson, Barbara Jane Freck, Lynn Muserelli. Waiver sent to Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gyandoh, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Jaleeza Owens, Gloria Robinson, Barbara Jane Freck, Lynn Muserelli. Waiver sent to Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gyandoh, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Gloria Robinson. Waiver sent to Cerner Corporation on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gyandoh, Mark)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Mark K. Gyandoh for plaintiffs allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to allow Mark K. Gyandoh to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6685190) filed by Kristie Blunt Welder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Welder, Kristie)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Melvin, Greg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kristie Blunt Welder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6683905. Service due by 4/20/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Welder, Kristie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freck et al v. Cerner Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compensation Committee of the Cerner Corporation Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc G. Naughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M. Dillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Riedel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L. Gerberding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerner Corporation Foundations Retirement Plan Administrative and Investment Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Zollars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halsey Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Muserelli
Represented By: Kristie Blunt Welder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Robinson
Represented By: Kristie Blunt Welder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaleeza Owens
Represented By: Kristie Blunt Welder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Jane Freck
Represented By: Kristie Blunt Welder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?