ClaimSolution, Inc. v. Legion Claims Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: ClaimSolution, Inc.
Defendant: Legion Claims Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00108
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by ClaimSolution, Inc.. Legion Claims Solutions, LLC served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (McAndrews, Patrick)
February 18, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Legion Claims Solutions, LLC. (Kern, Kendra)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) 3,324,297. Plaintiff(s): CLAIMSOLUTION, INC Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Patrick McAndrews Defendant(s): LEGION CLAIMS SOLUTIONS, LLC The civil complaint is attached. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (Kern, Kendra)
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Patrick Jerome McAndrews on behalf of Plaintiff ClaimSolution, Inc..(McAndrews, Patrick)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Legion Claims Solutions, LLC filed by Patrick Jerome McAndrews on behalf of ClaimSolution, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6730340. Service due by 5/18/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McAndrews, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ClaimSolution, Inc. v. Legion Claims Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legion Claims Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ClaimSolution, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Jerome McAndrews
Represented By: Nathan A Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?