Watkins v. Saul
Plaintiff: James E Watkins
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00180
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Andrew M. Saul, James E Watkins. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Furtak, Rebecca)
March 18, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Melvin, Greg)
March 12, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Roger M. Driskill on behalf of James E Watkins. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMOWDC-6769822) Service due by 6/9/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Summit Gastroenterology, #3 Exhibit B Saint Luke)(Driskill, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Watkins
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?