Hilbert v. John Knox Village
Plaintiff: Kathy Hilbert
Defendant: John Knox Village
Case Number: 4:2020cv00200
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The parties have notified the Court that this case has reached resolution. The parties are ordered to file either dismissal paperwork or a joint status report by June 15, 2020. Signed on 4/16/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Jessica Lynn Barranco on behalf of John Knox Village (Attorney Jessica Lynn Barranco added to party John Knox Village(pty:dft))(Barranco, Jessica)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of John Knox Village.(Hilton, Timothy)
March 18, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/1/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 4/17/2020. Signed on 3/17/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Timothy A Hilton on behalf of Defendant John Knox Village.(Hilton, Timothy)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 2016-CV06119, filed by Timothy A Hilton on behalf of John Knox Village. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6779026. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A, #2 State Court Petition Exhibit B)(Hilton, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilbert v. John Knox Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Hilbert
Represented By: Noah Ballard
Represented By: Daniel L. Doyle
Represented By: Robert A Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Knox Village
Represented By: Timothy A Hilton
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?